MI HB6419 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-04 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-04 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming; other; fantasy contests and sports betting; allow. Amends sec. 310 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.310).
Title
Gaming; other; fantasy contests and sports betting; allow. Amends sec. 310 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.310).
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 658 (Y: 87 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2018-11-29 | House | Transmitted |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 658 Yeas 87 Nays 22 |
2018-11-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-11-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-10-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-10-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-10-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/02/2018 |
2018-10-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-10-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-10-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |