MI HB6397 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 571'18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 571'18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Legislature; legislative agencies; the legislative corrections ombudsman; exempt certain information from certain disclosure and clarify investigation procedures. Amends secs. 4, 5, 8 & 9 of 1975 PA 46 (MCL 4.354 et seq.).
Title
Legislature; legislative agencies; the legislative corrections ombudsman; exempt certain information from certain disclosure and clarify investigation procedures. Amends secs. 4, 5, 8 & 9 of 1975 PA 46 (MCL 4.354 et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. John Bizon [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 1030 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 970 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 660 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 970 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 660 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 571'18 |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 3:22 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 12:13 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 4:46 Pm |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 1030 Yeas 105 Nays 1 |
2018-12-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-12-21 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 970 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2018-11-29 | House | Transmitted |
2018-11-29 | House | Title Amended |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 660 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-11-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-11-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-11-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-11-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-09-27 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/26/2018 |
2018-09-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-09-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-09-26 | House | Introduced By Representative John Bizon |