MI HB6396 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; juvenile justice services; county juvenile justice services reimbursements; modify. Amends sec. 117a of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.117a).
Title
Juveniles; juvenile justice services; county juvenile justice services reimbursements; modify. Amends sec. 117a of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.117a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-09-27 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/26/2018 |
2018-09-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-09-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-09-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Martin Howrylak |