MI HB6381 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; individual licensing and regulation; annual report on issuance or denial of licensure based on lack of good moral character; require. Amends sec. 411 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.411). TIE BAR WITH: HB 6110'18
Title
Occupations; individual licensing and regulation; annual report on issuance or denial of licensure based on lack of good moral character; require. Amends sec. 411 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.411). TIE BAR WITH: HB 6110'18
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Moss [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 615 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 615 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-10-03 | House | Transmitted |
2018-10-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 615 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2018-10-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-10-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-10-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-10-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-10-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-09-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/25/2018 |
2018-09-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-09-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-09-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeremy Moss |
Subjects
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
Occupations: other
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State agencies (proposed): boards and commissions
Occupations: other
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State agencies (proposed): boards and commissions