MI HB6333 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 300'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 300'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Legislature: other; selection of seats in the house of representatives; modify. Amends sec. 1 of 1893 PA 58 (MCL 4.61).
Title
Legislature: other; selection of seats in the house of representatives; modify. Amends sec. 1 of 1893 PA 58 (MCL 4.61).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 650 (Y: 60 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 631 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 506 (Y: 59 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 631 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 506 (Y: 59 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 300'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 02:12 Pm |
2020-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/29/2020 10:24 Am |
2020-12-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 05:31 Pm |
2020-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-21 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 650 Yeas 60 Nays 42 Excused 0 Not Voting 8 |
2020-12-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-12-21 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 631 Yeas 20 Nays 16 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-12-02 | House | Transmitted |
2020-12-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 506 Yeas 59 Nays 45 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2020-12-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-01 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-12-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-11-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/18/2020 |
2020-11-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-11-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-11-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Steven Johnson |