MI HB6300 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 261'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 261'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: other; procedures for insurance holding companies' annual capital calculation; provide for. Amends sec. 1355 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1355).
Title
Insurance: other; procedures for insurance holding companies' annual capital calculation; provide for. Amends sec. 1355 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1355).
Sponsors
Sen. Sarah Anthony [D] | Rep. Andrew Beeler [R] | Rep. Mike Harris [R] | Rep. Richard Steenland [D] |
Rep. Ken Borton [R] | Rep. Julie Calley [R] | Rep. Tim Sneller [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | House | Assigned Pa 261'22 |
2022-12-08 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2022 04:18 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/22/2022 02:32 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2022 12:00 Pm |
2022-12-07 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-07 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-12-07 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 535 Yeas 31 Nays 0 Excused 7 Not Voting 0 |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-10-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Banking |
2022-09-28 | House | Transmitted |
2022-09-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 439 Yeas 99 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2022-09-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-09-28 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-09-28 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-09-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-09-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-09-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2022-07-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/30/2022 |
2022-06-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness |
2022-06-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-06-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Sarah Anthony |