MI HB6298 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: driver license; waiver of knowledge test for an individual with military commercial motor vehicle experience; provide for.
Title
Traffic control: driver license; waiver of knowledge test for an individual with military commercial motor vehicle experience; provide for.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-10-21 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/21/2020 |
2020-10-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2020-10-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-10-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Gregory Markkanen |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-6298 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-6298.htm |