MI HB6297 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Assigned Pa 249'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Assigned Pa 249'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations: notaries public; a notary to utilize 2-way real-time audiovisual technology for notarial acts in certain circumstances; allow. Amends secs. 3, 9, 26 & 26b of 2003 PA 238 (MCL 55.263 et seq.) & adds secs. 26c and 26d.
Title
Occupations: notaries public; a notary to utilize 2-way real-time audiovisual technology for notarial acts in certain circumstances; allow. Amends secs. 3, 9, 26 & 26b of 2003 PA 238 (MCL 55.263 et seq.) & adds secs. 26c and 26d.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 416 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 475 (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 475 (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-05 | House | Assigned Pa 249'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-11-05 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/05/2020 11:20 Am |
2020-11-05 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/05/2020 10:08 Am |
2020-10-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/26/2020 03:08 Pm |
2020-10-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled 10/21/2020 |
2020-10-28 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 416 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-10-13 | House | Transmitted |
2020-10-13 | House | Title Amended |
2020-10-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 475 Yeas 101 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2020-10-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-10-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-10-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-10-13 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted And Amended |
2020-10-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-10-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-10-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-10-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/08/2020 |
2020-10-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-10-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-10-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Sarah Lightner |