MI HB6296 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Assigned Pa 248'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Property: recording; procedures under the uniform real property electronic recording act; revise to deal with the COVID-19 emergency. Amends secs. 3 & 4 of 2010 PA 123 (MCL 565.843 & 565.844) & adds sec. 5a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6297'20

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property: recording; procedures under the uniform real property electronic recording act; revise to deal with the COVID-19 emergency. Amends secs. 3 & 4 of 2010 PA 123 (MCL 565.843 & 565.844) & adds sec. 5a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6297'20

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 415 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 474 (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-05HouseAssigned Pa 248'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-11-05HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 11/05/2020 11:18 Am
2020-11-05HouseApproved By The Governor 11/05/2020 10:06 Am
2020-10-28HousePresented To The Governor 10/26/2020 03:06 Pm
2020-10-21HouseBill Ordered Enrolled 10/21/2020
2020-10-28HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2020-10-21SenateInserted Full Title
2020-10-21SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 415 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-10-21SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-10-21SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2020-10-21SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2020-10-21SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2020-10-21SenateRules Suspended
2020-10-13HouseTransmitted
2020-10-13HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 474 Yeas 102 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
2020-10-13HouseRead A Third Time
2020-10-13HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-10-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-10-13HouseSubstitute (h-3) Adopted
2020-10-13HouseSubstitute (h-2) Not Adopted
2020-10-13HouseRead A Second Time
2020-10-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-10-13HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
2020-10-08HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 10/08/2020
2020-10-08HouseReferred To Committee On Government Operations
2020-10-08HouseRead A First Time
2020-10-08HouseIntroduced By Representative Sarah Lightner

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback