MI HB6278 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-03 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-03 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Military affairs: generally; Michigan Great Lakes medal of valor; establish, and provide eligibility requirements. Amends 1967 PA 150 (MCL 32.501 - 32.851) by adding sec. 184. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6279'20, HB 6276'20, HB 6277'20
Title
Military affairs: generally; Michigan Great Lakes medal of valor; establish, and provide eligibility requirements. Amends 1967 PA 150 (MCL 32.501 - 32.851) by adding sec. 184. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6279'20, HB 6276'20, HB 6277'20
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Glenn [R] | Rep. Beau LaFave [R] | Rep. Gregory Markkanen [R] | Rep. Gary Howell [R] |
Rep. Lynn Afendoulis [R] | Rep. Ryan Berman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-09-30 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/29/2020 |
2020-09-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2020-09-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Annette Glenn |
Subjects
Legislature: other
Military affairs: generally
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs
Military affairs: generally
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-6278 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-6278.htm |