MI HB6267 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate income tax: credits; distributor credit for returnable containers; provide for. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding secs. 279 & 679.
Title
Corporate income tax: credits; distributor credit for returnable containers; provide for. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding secs. 279 & 679.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-12-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-09-30 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/29/2020 |
2020-09-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-09-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |