MI HB6235 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure: other; denial to issue or renew driver license for failure to appear; prohibit. Amends sec. 8827 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.8827). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5846'20

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure: other; denial to issue or renew driver license for failure to appear; prohibit. Amends sec. 8827 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.8827). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5846'20

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 455 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-29SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2020-09-24HouseTransmitted
2020-09-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 455 Yeas 104 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
2020-09-24HouseRead A Third Time
2020-09-24HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-09-24HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-09-24HouseRead A Second Time
2020-09-24HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-09-24HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2020-09-22HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/22/2020
2020-09-16HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2020-09-16HouseRead A First Time
2020-09-16HouseIntroduced By Representative Cynthia Neeley

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback