MI HB6205 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Animals; other; animal industry act; modify. Amends title & secs. 1, 3, 7, 9, 11b, 12, 14, 19, 20, 22, 31, 39, 40, 43 & 44 of 1988 PA 466 (MCL 287.701 et seq.); adds secs. 3a, 3b, 12a, 12b, 14a, 17b, 17c, 17d, 43a & 43b & repeals secs. 4, 5, 6, 8, 10, 13, 13a, 15, 16, 17a, 23, 24, 26a, 27, 28, 29, 29a, 30, 30a, 30b, 30c, 30d, 33, 35, 41 & 46 of 1988 PA 466 (MCL 287.704 et seq.).
Title
Animals; other; animal industry act; modify. Amends title & secs. 1, 3, 7, 9, 11b, 12, 14, 19, 20, 22, 31, 39, 40, 43 & 44 of 1988 PA 466 (MCL 287.701 et seq.); adds secs. 3a, 3b, 12a, 12b, 14a, 17b, 17c, 17d, 43a & 43b & repeals secs. 4, 5, 6, 8, 10, 13, 13a, 15, 16, 17a, 23, 24, 26a, 27, 28, 29, 29a, 30, 30a, 30b, 30c, 30d, 33, 35, 41 & 46 of 1988 PA 466 (MCL 287.704 et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 1022 (Y: 71 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 975 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 702 (Y: 94 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 975 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 702 (Y: 94 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 4:36 Pm |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-12-21 | House | Roll Call # 1022 Yeas 71 Nays 36 |
2018-12-21 | House | Senate Substitute S-6 Concurred In |
2018-12-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-12-21 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-6 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 975 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-6 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Substitute S-6 Concurred In |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-6 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2018-12-05 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-05 | House | Title Amended |
2018-12-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 702 Yeas 94 Nays 14 |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2018-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-11-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-08-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Dan Lauwers |