MI HB6201 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-08 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Natural resources; gas and oil; requirements for spill reporting and prevention response plans from straits gas or oil pipelines; modify, and provide penalties for releases of gas or oil into waters of the state. Amends secs. 3101, 3103, 3111b & 3115 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.3101 et seq.) & adds secs. 3111c, 3111d, 3111e, 3115b & 3135.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural resources; gas and oil; requirements for spill reporting and prevention response plans from straits gas or oil pipelines; modify, and provide penalties for releases of gas or oil into waters of the state. Amends secs. 3101, 3103, 3111b & 3115 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.3101 et seq.) & adds secs. 3111c, 3111d, 3111e, 3115b & 3135.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 606 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-08SenateReferred To Committee On Government Operations
2018-10-03HouseTransmitted
2018-10-03HouseTitle Amended
2018-10-03HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 606 Yeas 105 Nays 2
2018-10-03HouseRead A Third Time
2018-10-02HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-10-02HouseSubstitute H-5 Adopted
2018-10-02HouseRead A Second Time
2018-09-26HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-09-26HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5
2018-08-15HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 06/12/2018
2018-06-12HouseReferred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness
2018-06-12HouseRead A First Time
2018-06-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Lee Chatfield

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback