MI HB6200 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-27 - Referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: Senate Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-27 - Referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: Senate Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Human services: county services; notice to legislature of suspension of payments; require. Amends sec. 111f of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.111f).
Title
Human services: county services; notice to legislature of suspension of payments; require. Amends sec. 111f of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.111f).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 413 (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2022-09-21 | House | Transmitted |
2022-09-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 413 Yeas 62 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 9 |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-06-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/09/2022 |
2022-06-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2022-06-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-06-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Mark Tisdel |