MI HB6193 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-10 - Re-referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: House Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-10 - Re-referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: House Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Housing: inspection; provision related to infected and uninhabitable dwellings to be vacated; modify. Amends sec. 85 of 1917 PA 167 (MCL 125.485).
Title
Housing: inspection; provision related to infected and uninhabitable dwellings to be vacated; modify. Amends sec. 85 of 1917 PA 167 (MCL 125.485).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 374 (Y: 56 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 374 (Y: 56 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-10 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Oversight |
2022-10-13 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 10/14/2022 |
2022-09-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/05/2022 12:07 Pm |
2022-09-28 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-09-28 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-09-28 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 449 Yeas 22 Nays 14 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Oversight |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-09-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-07-01 | House | Transmitted |
2022-07-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 374 Yeas 56 Nays 48 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2022-07-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-07-01 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-07-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-07-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-06-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/09/2022 |
2022-06-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2022-06-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-06-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrew Fink |