MI HB6190 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-31 - Pocket Veto 01/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-31 - Pocket Veto 01/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Health: other; public swimming pool requirements; modify to include learn to swim facilities. Amends secs. 12521, 12522, 12523, 12524, 12525, 12526, 12527, 12527a, 12528, 12529, 12530, 12531, 12531a, 12532, 12533 & 12534 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.12521 et seq.).
Title
Health: other; public swimming pool requirements; modify to include learn to swim facilities. Amends secs. 12521, 12522, 12523, 12524, 12525, 12526, 12527, 12527a, 12528, 12529, 12530, 12531, 12531a, 12532, 12533 & 12534 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.12521 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 522 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 447 (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 447 (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Pocket Veto 01/05/2021 |
2020-12-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 06:07 Pm |
2020-12-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 522 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-09-24 | House | Transmitted |
2020-09-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 447 Yeas 104 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-09-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-09-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-24 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-09-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-09-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-09-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/09/2020 |
2020-09-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-09-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Michael Webber |
Subjects
Health: other
Recreation: swimming pools
State agencies (existing): environment, Great Lakes, and energy
Recreation: swimming pools
State agencies (existing): environment, Great Lakes, and energy