MI HB6187 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-08 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-08 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Watercraft; other; markers or signage alerting vessel operators of the prohibition on the use of anchors in the Straits of Mackinac; require department of natural resources to install. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding sec. 80158b. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6200'18
Title
Watercraft; other; markers or signage alerting vessel operators of the prohibition on the use of anchors in the Straits of Mackinac; require department of natural resources to install. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding sec. 80158b. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6200'18
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Allor [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 607 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2018-10-03 | House | Transmitted |
2018-10-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 607 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2018-10-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-10-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-10-02 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-10-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-09-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-09-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-08-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Sue Allor |