MI HB6173 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-01 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-01 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer protection: marketing and advertising; disclosure from third-party websites conducting state business; require. Amends sec. 3 of 1976 PA 331 (MCL 445.903) & adds sec. 3l.
Title
Consumer protection: marketing and advertising; disclosure from third-party websites conducting state business; require. Amends sec. 3 of 1976 PA 331 (MCL 445.903) & adds sec. 3l.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-09-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/03/2020 |
2020-09-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-09-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Sarah Lightner |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-6173 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-6173.htm |