MI HB6171 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education: tuition; tuition grants; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 1966 PA 313 (MCL 390.993).
Title
Higher education: tuition; tuition grants; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 1966 PA 313 (MCL 390.993).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-09-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-09-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/03/2020 |
2020-09-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2020-09-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Scott Vansingel |