MI HB6162 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax: credit; tax credit for charitable donations to food banks and shelters; provide for. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 260.
Title
Individual income tax: credit; tax credit for charitable donations to food banks and shelters; provide for. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 260.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Tate [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 388 (Y: 82 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2020-09-22 | House | Transmitted |
2020-09-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 388 Yeas 82 Nays 23 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-09-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-09-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/02/2020 |
2020-09-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-09-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Joseph Tate |