MI HB6137 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3)
Status: Passed on November 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Assigned Pa 244'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3)
Status: Passed on November 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Assigned Pa 244'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health facilities: nursing homes; additional requirements for certain homes for the aged and nursing homes dedicated as CARE facilities and residents who test positive for coronavirus; provide for. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 5145a TIE BAR WITH: SB 1094'20
Title
Health facilities: nursing homes; additional requirements for certain homes for the aged and nursing homes dedicated as CARE facilities and residents who test positive for coronavirus; provide for. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 5145a TIE BAR WITH: SB 1094'20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 417 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 485 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 485 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-05 | House | Assigned Pa 244'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-11-05 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/05/2020 11:10 Am |
2020-11-05 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/05/2020 09:58 Am |
2020-10-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/26/2020 03:02 Pm |
2020-10-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled 10/21/2020 |
2020-10-28 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 417 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-10-14 | House | Transmitted |
2020-10-14 | House | Title Amended |
2020-10-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 485 Yeas 101 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 8 |
2020-10-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-10-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-10-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-10-14 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-10-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-10-13 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2020-10-13 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-10-13 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-09-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2020-09-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/01/2020 |
2020-09-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2020-09-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Leslie Love |
Subjects
Health facilities: homes for the aged
Health facilities: nursing homes
Health: diseases
State agencies (existing): health and human services
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Health facilities: nursing homes
Health: diseases
State agencies (existing): health and human services
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs