MI HB6132 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-16 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-16 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: vehicle offenses; vehicle immobilization requirements; modify. Amends secs. 219, 904c & 904f of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.219 et seq.).
Title
Crimes: vehicle offenses; vehicle immobilization requirements; modify. Amends secs. 219, 904c & 904f of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.219 et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Mueller [R] | Rep. Tim Sneller [D] | Rep. Sara Cambensy [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] |
Sen. John Cherry [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-15 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 382 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 376 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 376 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2020-09-15 | House | Transmitted |
2020-09-15 | House | Passed Roll Call # 382 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-15 | House | Vote Reconsidered |
2020-09-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 376 Yeas 108 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-09-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-09-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/17/2020 |
2020-08-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-08-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-08-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Mike Mueller |