MI HB6130 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 252'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 252'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education: financial aid; Michigan reconnect grant recipient act; modify. Amends secs. 11, 13, 15, 16, 17, 18, 21 & 23 of 2020 PA 68 (MCL 390.1711 et seq.).
Title
Higher education: financial aid; Michigan reconnect grant recipient act; modify. Amends secs. 11, 13, 15, 16, 17, 18, 21 & 23 of 2020 PA 68 (MCL 390.1711 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | House | Assigned Pa 252'22 |
2022-12-08 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2022 04:00 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/22/2022 02:14 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2022 11:52 Am |
2022-12-07 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-07 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-12-07 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 527 Yeas 24 Nays 7 Excused 6 Not Voting 1 |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-10-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2022-09-28 | House | Transmitted |
2022-09-28 | House | Title Amended |
2022-09-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 435 Yeas 83 Nays 23 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2022-09-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-09-28 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-09-28 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2022-09-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-09-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-09-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2022-05-25 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/24/2022 |
2022-05-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2022-05-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-05-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Sarah Anthony |