MI HB6107 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 650'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 650'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; offenses; felony penalty for signing a petition with multiple names; provide for. Amends secs. 544c, 590h, 685 & 954 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.544c et seq.) & adds sec. 482a.
Title
Elections; offenses; felony penalty for signing a petition with multiple names; provide for. Amends secs. 544c, 590h, 685 & 954 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.544c et seq.) & adds sec. 482a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 1020 (Y: 95 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1004 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 582 (Y: 94 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1004 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 582 (Y: 94 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 650'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 6:52 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 5:43 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 4:02 Pm |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-12-21 | House | Roll Call # 1020 Yeas 95 Nays 12 |
2018-12-21 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-12-21 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1004 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2018-09-26 | House | Transmitted |
2018-09-26 | House | Title Amended |
2018-09-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 582 Yeas 94 Nays 13 |
2018-09-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-09-26 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-09-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-09-26 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-09-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-06-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-06-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/06/2018 |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2018-06-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Kim Lasata |