MI HB6063 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 418'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 418'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; recall; time to submit recall petition to the board of state canvassers or the board of county election commissioners; provide for. Amends 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.952 - 168.992) by adding sec. 952b.
Title
Elections; recall; time to submit recall petition to the board of state canvassers or the board of county election commissioners; provide for. Amends 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.952 - 168.992) by adding sec. 952b.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffry Farrington [R] | Rep. Anthony Forlini [R] | Rep. Ken Goike [R] | Rep. Harold Haugh [D] |
Rep. Andrea LaFontaine [R] | Rep. Marilyn Lane [D] | Rep. Lesia Liss [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 887 (Y: 65 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1017 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 687 (Y: 65 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1017 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 687 (Y: 65 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | House | Assigned Pa 418'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2012 @ 2:44 Pm |
2012-12-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 10:16 Am |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/19/2012 @ 3:12 Pm |
2012-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | House | Rep. Jon Switalski[*][*] Removed As Co-sponsor |
2012-12-14 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2012-12-14 | House | Roll Call # 887 Yeas 65 Nays 40 |
2012-12-14 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1017 Yeas 22 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-05 | House | Transmitted |
2012-12-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 687 Yeas 65 Nays 43 |
2012-12-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-11-29 | House | Printed Bill Filed 11/29/2012 |
2012-11-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Redistricting And Elections |
2012-11-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Harold Haugh |