MI HB6061 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Marihuana: other; individuals who are 18 years of age or older; allow to be employed by or volunteer for marihuana establishments. Amends title & secs. 4, 5, 10 & 11 of 2018 IL 1 (MCL 333.27954 et seq.).
Title
Marihuana: other; individuals who are 18 years of age or older; allow to be employed by or volunteer for marihuana establishments. Amends title & secs. 4, 5, 10 & 11 of 2018 IL 1 (MCL 333.27954 et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Coleman [D] | Rep. Alex Garza [D] | Rep. Tullio Liberati [D] | Rep. Yousef Rabhi [D] |
Rep. Graham Filler [R] | Rep. Brenda Carter [D] | Rep. Helena Scott [D] | Rep. Tyrone Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-09-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-05-04 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/03/2022 |
2022-05-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-05-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-05-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Coleman |