MI HB6058 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; recall; appealing a determination of sufficient clarity; clarify as a stay for circulating recall petitions for signatures. Amends secs. 952 & 961 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.952 & 168.961).
Title
Elections; recall; appealing a determination of sufficient clarity; clarify as a stay for circulating recall petitions for signatures. Amends secs. 952 & 961 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.952 & 168.961).
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffry Farrington [R] | Rep. Anthony Forlini [R] | Rep. Ken Goike [R] | Rep. Harold Haugh [D] |
Rep. Andrea LaFontaine [R] | Rep. Marilyn Lane [D] | Rep. Lesia Liss [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 684 (Y: 65 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-05 | House | Transmitted |
2012-12-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 684 Yeas 65 Nays 43 |
2012-12-05 | House | Amended |
2012-12-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2012-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-11-29 | House | Printed Bill Filed 11/29/2012 |
2012-11-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Redistricting And Elections |
2012-11-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Marilyn Lane |