MI HB6040 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 230'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 230'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education: dual enrollment; postsecondary enrollment options act; modify to allow certain eligible students to participate in intercollegiate athletics. Amends sec. 5 of 1996 PA 160 (MCL 388.515).
Title
Education: dual enrollment; postsecondary enrollment options act; modify to allow certain eligible students to participate in intercollegiate athletics. Amends sec. 5 of 1996 PA 160 (MCL 388.515).
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Morse [D] | Rep. Pauline Wendzel [R] | Rep. Regina Weiss [D] | Rep. Rachel Hood [D] |
Rep. Yousef Rabhi [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 383 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | House | Assigned Pa 230'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-12-08 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/13/2022 04:04 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/13/2022 02:02 Pm |
2022-12-06 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/05/2022 02:03 Pm |
2022-11-30 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-11-30 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-11-30 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 485 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness |
2022-09-21 | House | Transmitted |
2022-09-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 383 Yeas 105 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-05-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-05-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-04-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/14/2022 |
2022-04-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2022-04-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-04-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Christine Morse |