MI HB6032 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Assigned Pa 238'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Assigned Pa 238'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Labor: fair employment practices; employer taking adverse employment action against an employee who is absent from work because of COVID-19; prohibit. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6030'20, HB 6031'20, HB 6101'20
Title
Labor: fair employment practices; employer taking adverse employment action against an employee who is absent from work because of COVID-19; prohibit. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6030'20, HB 6031'20, HB 6101'20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 490 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 404 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 406 (Y: 83 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 403 (Y: 73 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 404 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 406 (Y: 83 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 403 (Y: 73 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-28 | House | Assigned Pa 238'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-10-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/22/2020 12:24 Pm |
2020-10-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/22/2020 11:38 Am |
2020-10-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/16/2020 01:56 Pm |
2020-10-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-10-14 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-10-14 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 490 Yeas 101 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 8 |
2020-10-14 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-10-14 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-10-14 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-10-14 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Title Amended |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 404 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2020-09-23 | House | Transmitted |
2020-09-23 | House | Passed Roll Call # 406 Yeas 83 Nays 23 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-09-23 | House | Vote Reconsidered |
2020-09-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 403 Yeas 73 Nays 33 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-09-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-22 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-09-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-08-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/23/2020 |
2020-07-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-07-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-07-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Graham Filler |