MI HB6023 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-29 - Referred To Committee On Campaign And Election Oversight
Pending: Senate Campaign & Election Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-29 - Referred To Committee On Campaign And Election Oversight
Pending: Senate Campaign & Election Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance; campaign practices; ban on acceptance of honoraria by legislators; expand to include statewide elective offices. Amends sec. 50 of 1976 PA 388 (MCL 169.250).
Title
Campaign finance; campaign practices; ban on acceptance of honoraria by legislators; expand to include statewide elective offices. Amends sec. 50 of 1976 PA 388 (MCL 169.250).
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Segal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Referred To Committee On Campaign And Election Oversight | |
2010-09-28 | Transmitted | |
2010-09-28 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 433 Yeas 104 Nays 0 | |
2010-09-28 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-09-28 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-09-28 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-09-28 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-09-22 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-09-22 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-04-13 | Printed Bill Filed 03/26/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Referred To Committee On Ethics And Elections | |
2010-03-25 | Read A First Time | |
2010-03-25 | Introduced By Representative Kate Segal |