MI HB6011 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 621'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 621'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; driver license; national driver license compact; enter into. Creates new act.
Title
Traffic control; driver license; national driver license compact; enter into. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 876 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 577 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 577 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 621'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 5:54 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 4:21 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 7:50 Pm |
2018-12-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 876 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-09-26 | House | Transmitted |
2018-09-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 577 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2018-09-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-09-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-09-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-06-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-06-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-05-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/16/2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-05-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Noble |
Subjects
State agencies (existing): state
State: interstate compacts and agreements
Traffic control: driver license
State: interstate compacts and agreements
Traffic control: driver license