MI HB6009 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 411'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 411'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; mining; rural development fund; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6008'12
Title
Natural resources; mining; rural development fund; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6008'12
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Huuki [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 904 (Y: 65 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 990 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 650 (Y: 61 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 990 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 650 (Y: 61 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | House | Assigned Pa 411'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2012 @ 2:30 Pm |
2012-12-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 10:34 Am |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/18/2012 @ 4:14 Pm |
2012-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 904 Yeas 65 Nays 40 |
2012-12-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 990 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2012-11-29 | House | Transmitted |
2012-11-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 650 Yeas 61 Nays 47 |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-28 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2012-11-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-11-27 | House | Printed Bill Filed 11/09/2012 |
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2012-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Matt Huuki |
Subjects
Agriculture, other
Economic development, other
Natural resources, funding
Natural resources, mining
Natural resources, other
Recreation, tourism
Economic development, other
Natural resources, funding
Natural resources, mining
Natural resources, other
Recreation, tourism