MI HB6007 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-01 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-01 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mobile homes: sales; payment of fair market value to owner of an abandoned mobile home in certain circumstances; require. Amends 1987 PA 96 (MCL 125.2301 - 125.2350) by adding sec. 30j.
Title
Mobile homes: sales; payment of fair market value to owner of an abandoned mobile home in certain circumstances; require. Amends 1987 PA 96 (MCL 125.2301 - 125.2350) by adding sec. 30j.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Hertel [D] | Sen. John Cherry [D] | Rep. Bronna Kahle [R] | Rep. Tim Sneller [D] |
Rep. Mike Mueller [R] | Rep. Ben Frederick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-08-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/23/2020 |
2020-07-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-07-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-07-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Hertel |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-6007 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-6007.htm |