MI HB5985 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 214'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; indigent defense; Michigan indigent defense commission; modify. Amends secs. 3, 5, 7, 9, 11, 13, 15 & 17 of 2013 PA 93 (MCL 780.983 et seq.) & adds sec 22.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; indigent defense; Michigan indigent defense commission; modify. Amends secs. 3, 5, 7, 9, 11, 13, 15 & 17 of 2013 PA 93 (MCL 780.983 et seq.) & adds sec 22.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 516 (Y: 97 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 444 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 390 (Y: 94 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-15HouseAssigned Pa 214'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-08-15HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 6/26/2018 @ 1:38 Pm
2018-08-15HouseApproved By The Governor 6/25/2018 @ 4:52 Pm
2018-08-15HousePresented To The Governor 6/20/2018 @ 2:32 Pm
2018-06-12HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-06-12HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-06-12House Roll Call # 516 Yeas 97 Nays 12
2018-06-12HouseSenate Substitute S-3 Concurred In
2018-06-12HouseRule Suspended
2018-06-12HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2018-06-12HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-3 With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-06-12SenateInserted Full Title
2018-06-12SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 444 Yeas 27 Nays 9 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-06-12SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-06-12SenateRules Suspended
2018-06-12SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3
2018-06-12SenateSubstitute S-3 Concurred In
2018-06-12SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3
2018-06-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
2018-06-12SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-06-12SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-2
2018-05-29SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2018-05-23HouseTransmitted
2018-05-23HouseTitle Amended
2018-05-23HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 390 Yeas 94 Nays 15
2018-05-23HouseRead A Third Time
2018-05-23HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-05-23HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-05-23HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted And Amended
2018-05-23HouseSubstitute H-1 Not Adopted
2018-05-23HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-17HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-17HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2018-05-16HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/15/2018
2018-05-15HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2018-05-15HouseRead A First Time
2018-05-15HouseIntroduced By Representative Rob Verheulen

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-5985
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-5985.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-5985.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-5985.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-5985.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0214.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-17-050.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-23-052.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-06-12-060.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-06-12-059.htm

Bill Comments

feedback