MI HB5976 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-11 - Assigned Pa 202'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-11 - Assigned Pa 202'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human services: other; annual report by the department of health and human services; require to submit to legislature. Amends 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.951 - 722.960) by adding sec. 3a.
Title
Human services: other; annual report by the department of health and human services; require to submit to legislature. Amends 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.951 - 722.960) by adding sec. 3a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 418 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 257 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 257 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | House | Assigned Pa 202'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-10-11 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/07/2022 05:02 Pm |
2022-10-11 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/07/2022 03:42 Pm |
2022-09-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 09/26/2022 03:15 Pm |
2022-09-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-09-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-09-21 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 418 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2022-05-24 | House | Transmitted |
2022-05-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 257 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2022-05-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-05-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-05-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-05-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-05-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/24/2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2022-03-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-03-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Tyrone Carter |