MI HB5968 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Controlled substances: opioids; Michigan opioid healing and recovery fund; create. Amends sec. 2 of 2000 PA 489 (MCL 12.252) & adds sec. 3.
Title
Controlled substances: opioids; Michigan opioid healing and recovery fund; create. Amends sec. 2 of 2000 PA 489 (MCL 12.252) & adds sec. 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 177 (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2022-04-28 | House | Transmitted |
2022-04-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 177 Yeas 89 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2022-04-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-04-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-04-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-04-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-04-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/24/2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2022-03-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-03-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Mary Whiteford |