MI HB5942 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 532'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 532'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; other; penalties for threatening a school with a firearm or other deadly or dangerous weapon; provide for. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 235b.
Title
Crimes; other; penalties for threatening a school with a firearm or other deadly or dangerous weapon; provide for. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 235b.
Sponsors
Rep. Beau LaFave [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 847 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 511 (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 511 (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 532'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 2:14 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 3:11 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 5:56 Pm |
2018-12-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 847 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-06-12 | House | Transmitted |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 511 Yeas 99 Nays 10 |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-06-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Amended |
2018-06-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-06-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-06-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-05-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/08/2018 |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-05-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Beau Lafave |