MI HB5941 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on July 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: third party administrators; definition and regulation of a pharmacy benefit manager; provide for, and regulate certain actions by a carrier relating to prescriptions drugs. Amends title & sec. 2 of 1984 PA 218 (MCL 550.902) & adds secs. 26 & 27.
Title
Insurance: third party administrators; definition and regulation of a pharmacy benefit manager; provide for, and regulate certain actions by a carrier relating to prescriptions drugs. Amends title & sec. 2 of 1984 PA 218 (MCL 550.902) & adds secs. 26 & 27.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Wentworth [R] | Rep. Henry Vaupel [R] | Rep. Ben Frederick [R] | Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] | Rep. Tyrone Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-07-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/21/2020 |
2020-07-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2020-07-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-07-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Wentworth |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-5941 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-5941.htm |