MI HB5939 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
School aid: membership; requirements concerning a pupil’s enrollment in a district other than the pupil’s district of residence for purposes of membership; modify with regard to certain pupils whose parent or legal guardian is a member of the Armed Forces of the United States. Amends sec. 6 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1606).
Title
School aid: membership; requirements concerning a pupil’s enrollment in a district other than the pupil’s district of residence for purposes of membership; modify with regard to certain pupils whose parent or legal guardian is a member of the Armed Forces of the United States. Amends sec. 6 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1606).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-09-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2022-03-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/22/2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2022-03-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-03-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrew Beeler |