MI HB5939 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: health benefits; formulary changes during a plan year; regulate. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 3406v.
Title
Insurance: health benefits; formulary changes during a plan year; regulate. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 3406v.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-07-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/21/2020 |
2020-07-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2020-07-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-07-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Hank Vaupel |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-5939 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-5939.htm |