MI HB5926 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 330'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 330'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Land use; zoning and growth management; technical corrections; provide for. Amends secs. 208, 601 & 606 of 2006 PA 110 (MCL 125.3208 et seq.).
Title
Land use; zoning and growth management; technical corrections; provide for. Amends secs. 208, 601 & 606 of 2006 PA 110 (MCL 125.3208 et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. John Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 330'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2010 @ 12:30 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By The Governor 12/21/2010 @ 11:38 Am | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To The Governor 12/10/2010 @ 2:56 Pm | |
2010-12-02 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-02 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-02 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 591 Yeas 33 Nays 0 Excused 4 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-12-01 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-11-30 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-11-30 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-11-10 | Transmitted | |
2010-11-10 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 457 Yeas 99 Nays 1 | |
2010-11-10 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-11-10 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-06-22 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-03-10 | Printed Bill Filed 03/10/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Referred To Committee On Intergovernmental And Regional Affairs | |
2010-03-09 | Read A First Time | |
2010-03-09 | Introduced By Representative John Walsh |
Subjects
Cities, ordinances
Counties, ordinances
Land use, planning
Land use, zoning and growth management
Townships, ordinances
Villages, ordinances
Counties, ordinances
Land use, planning
Land use, zoning and growth management
Townships, ordinances
Villages, ordinances