MI HB5918 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-05 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-05 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public employees and officers; state; post-employment benefits; revoke for certain terminated employees. Amends title of 1994 PA 350 (MCL 38.2701 - 38.2705) & adds sec. 3a.
Title
Public employees and officers; state; post-employment benefits; revoke for certain terminated employees. Amends title of 1994 PA 350 (MCL 38.2701 - 38.2705) & adds sec. 3a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 665 (Y: 91 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2018-12-04 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-04 | House | Title Amended |
2018-12-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 665 Yeas 91 Nays 15 |
2018-12-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-11-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-11-29 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-11-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-11-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2018-05-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Liability Reform |
2018-05-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Lucido |
Subjects
Labor: civil service employment
Public employees and officers: compensation and benefits
Public employees and officers: state
Retirement: health benefits
Public employees and officers: compensation and benefits
Public employees and officers: state
Retirement: health benefits