MI HB5917 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 448'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Labor; health and safety; construction safety commission; eliminate. Amends sec. 19 of 1974 PA 154 (MCL 408.1019) & repeals sec. 18 of 1974 PA 154 (MCL 408.1018). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5922'12, SB 1335'12, SB 1336'12

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor; health and safety; construction safety commission; eliminate. Amends sec. 19 of 1974 PA 154 (MCL 408.1019) & repeals sec. 18 of 1974 PA 154 (MCL 408.1018). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5922'12, SB 1335'12, SB 1336'12

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 952 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 669 (Y: 64 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 448'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/27/2012 @ 10:15 Am 2012 Addenda
2012-12-27HousePresented To The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 10:22 Am
2012-12-13HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2012-12-13HouseFull Title Agreed To
2012-12-13HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2012-12-13SenateInserted Full Title
2012-12-13SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 952 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-12-13SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-12-13SenateRules Suspended
2012-12-13SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2012-12-13SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2012-12-06SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2012-12-06SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-12-06SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2012-12-04SenateReferred To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing
2012-12-04HouseTransmitted
2012-12-04HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 669 Yeas 64 Nays 41
2012-12-04HouseRead A Third Time
2012-11-29HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-11-29HouseAmended
2012-11-29HouseRead A Second Time
2012-11-28HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-11-28HouseReported With Recommendation With Amendment(s)
2012-09-20HousePrinted Bill Filed 09/20/2012
2012-09-19HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2012-09-19HouseRead A First Time
2012-09-19HouseIntroduced By Representative Joseph Graves

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2012-HB-5917
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2012-HIB-5917.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/House/htm/2012-HEBH-5917.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/House/htm/2012-HEBS-5917.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/House/htm/2012-HNB-5917.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0448.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-11-28-075.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-04-077.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-06-077.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-13-080.htm

Bill Comments

feedback