MI HB5912 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-01 - Assigned Pa 148'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-01 - Assigned Pa 148'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education: other; certain requirements concerning required hours and days of pupil instruction; modify. Amends sec. 101 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1701). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5913'20, HB 5911'20
Title
Education: other; certain requirements concerning required hours and days of pupil instruction; modify. Amends sec. 101 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1701). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5913'20, HB 5911'20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-17 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 345 (Y: 77 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 265 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 339 (Y: 57 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 265 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 339 (Y: 57 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | House | Assigned Pa 148'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-09-01 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 08/20/2020 02:54 Pm |
2020-09-01 | House | Approved By The Governor 08/20/2020 11:49 Am |
2020-08-17 | House | Presented To The Governor 08/19/2020 10:39 Am |
2020-08-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-08-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-08-17 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 345 Yeas 77 Nays 29 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-08-17 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2020-08-17 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-08-17 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-08-17 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-08-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-08-15 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 265 Yeas 23 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-08-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2020-08-15 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-08-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-08-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-08-15 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2020-08-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-08-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2020-08-15 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness |
2020-07-22 | House | Transmitted |
2020-07-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 339 Yeas 57 Nays 47 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2020-07-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-07-22 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-07-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-07-22 | House | Substitute (h-4) Adopted And Amended |
2020-07-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-07-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-07-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-4) |
2020-07-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-3) |
2020-06-25 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/24/2020 |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2020-06-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-06-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrea Schroeder |