MI HB5902 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-07 - Assigned Pa 348'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-07 - Assigned Pa 348'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public utilities; public service commission; long-term industrial load rates; allow. Amends 1939 PA 3 (MCL 460.1 - 460.11) by adding sec. 10gg.
Title
Public utilities; public service commission; long-term industrial load rates; allow. Amends 1939 PA 3 (MCL 460.1 - 460.11) by adding sec. 10gg.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 589 (Y: 78 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 564 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 345 (Y: 77 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 564 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 345 (Y: 77 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-07 | House | Assigned Pa 348'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-11-07 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/24/2018 @ 9:00 Am |
2018-11-07 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/23/2018 @ 2:01 Pm |
2018-10-17 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/10/2018 @ 9:51 Am |
2018-10-02 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-10-02 | House | Roll Call # 589 Yeas 78 Nays 28 |
2018-10-02 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-09-27 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-09-27 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 564 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2018-05-17 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 345 Yeas 77 Nays 31 |
2018-05-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-16 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-05-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-05-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/01/2018 |
2018-05-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy Policy |
2018-05-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Dan Lauwers |
Subjects
Public utilities: electric utilities
Public utilities: public service commission
Public utilities: rates
Public utilities: public service commission
Public utilities: rates