MI HB5884 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines; update. Amends sec. 16m, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16m).
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines; update. Amends sec. 16m, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16m).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2022-03-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/08/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2022-03-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Ryan Berman |