MI HB5845 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles: driver training; virtual instruction for driver training courses and exemption to driver training for homeschooled student; create. Amends secs. 3, 7, 9, 35, 37, 39, 41 & 45 of 2006 PA 384 (MCL 256.623 et seq.).
Title
Vehicles: driver training; virtual instruction for driver training courses and exemption to driver training for homeschooled student; create. Amends secs. 3, 7, 9, 35, 37, 39, 41 & 45 of 2006 PA 384 (MCL 256.623 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-06-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/11/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-06-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-06-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Triston Cole |