MI HB5843 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: supplemental; funding for flood damage; provide for. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations: supplemental; funding for flood damage; provide for. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 245 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2020-06-17 | House | Transmitted |
2020-06-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 245 Yeas 107 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-06-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-06-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-06-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-06-17 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2020-06-17 | House | Substitute (h-1) Not Adopted |
2020-06-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-06-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-06-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-06-11 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/10/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2020-06-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-06-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Annette Glenn |