MI HB5843 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 455'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 455'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; other; organized retail crime act; create. Creates new act.
Title
Crimes; other; organized retail crime act; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 900 (Y: 102 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 985 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 614 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 985 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 614 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 455'12 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2012 @ 3:10 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/22/2012 @ 11:38 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 3:00 Pm |
2012-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 900 Yeas 102 Nays 3 |
2012-12-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 985 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Amendment(s) |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-11-28 | House | Transmitted |
2012-11-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 614 Yeas 107 Nays 2 |
2012-11-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-27 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2012-11-27 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2012-11-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-09-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-09-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-09-12 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/12/2012 |
2012-09-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2012-09-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-09-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Joseph Graves |
Subjects
Crimes, organized
Crimes, other
State agencies (existing), state police
Trade, consumer goods and services
Crimes, other
State agencies (existing), state police
Trade, consumer goods and services